Global Patent Index - EP 0900431 B1

EP 0900431 B1 2000-09-13 - Coin testing apparatus and method

Title (en)

Coin testing apparatus and method

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Prüfen von Münzen

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour examiner les pièces de monnaie

Publication

EP 0900431 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97918315 A

Priority

  • GB 9610603 A
  • IB 9700569 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9744760A1] A method of coin testing is provided in which a laser beam (13) is directed onto a face of a coin (4) and a laser detector (3) is used to detect where the laser beam is intercepted by the coin and where the laser beam is not intercepted by the coin, so as to obtain an indication of a characteristic of the face of the coin. The characteristic of the coin is used to identify the coin. The invention also relates to an apparatus for coin testing, which comprises a laser source (11) to direct a laser beam (13) onto a face of a coin (4), a laser detector (3) for detecting where the laser is intercepted by the coin and where the laser is not intercepted by the coin, and a signal-processor (14) which obtains an indication, from an output of the laser detector (3), of a characteristic of the face of the coin which is used to identify the coin.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 5/00 (2006.01); G07D 5/02 (2006.01); G07D 5/10 (2006.01); G07F 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 5/02 (2013.01); G07D 5/005 (2013.01); G07D 5/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9744760 A1 19971127; AR 008601 A1 20000209; AT 196378 T 20000915; AU 2648497 A 19971209; AU 716057 B2 20000217; BR 9709010 A 20000104; BR 9709010 B1 20081118; CA 2255642 A1 19971127; CA 2255642 C 20080401; CN 1135503 C 20040121; CN 1220750 A 19990623; DE 69703103 D1 20001019; DE 69703103 T2 20010118; EP 0900431 A1 19990310; EP 0900431 B1 20000913; EP 0996098 A2 20000426; EP 0996098 A3 20020731; ES 2150766 T3 20001201; GB 2327136 A 19990113; GB 9610603 D0 19960731; GB 9819877 D0 19981104; HK 1018919 A1 20011116; JP 2000510979 A 20000822; NZ 331979 A 20000825; SA 1218 B1 20060905; TW 352426 B 19990211; ZA 9704389 B 19990315

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160517

2017-05-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160517

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160531

2017-03-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160517

2017-02-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160517

2017-02-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2017-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160531

2017-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160531

2017-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160517

2017-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 196378 T

- Effective date: 20160517

2016-12-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69703103

2016-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160531

2015-08-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20150528

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150601

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150529

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150601

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150529

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150529

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150528

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150601

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150529

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-06-01 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-10-31 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: AZ FOURTHSTRINGS LIMITED, IE

- Effective date: 20141002

2014-10-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: AZ FOURTHSTRINGS LTD., IE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: PANZERI, EZIO, DUBLIN, IE

- Document: DE 69703103

- Effective date: 20140903

2014-10-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69703103

- Representative's name: WSL PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20140903

2014-09-17 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140821 AND 20140827

2014-09-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69703103

- Representative's name: WSL PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

2013-07-10 [R26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20010718

2009-05-22 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2009-03-27 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-09-30 [REG CH PK] CORRECTION

- Free text: RECTIFICATION TITULAIRE

2008-09-24 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2008-09-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ELIO PANZERI

- Free text: DIGITALL INC#3E LOOCKERMAN ST., SUITE 205#DOVER, DELAWARE (US) -TRANSFER TO- ELIO PANZERI#101 SHREWSBURY PARK#BALLSBRIDGE, D4 DUBLIN (IE)

2003-02-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-05-17 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010517

2001-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-12-15 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001215

2000-12-13 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-12-13 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-12-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-12-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARIETTI E GISLON S.R.L.

2000-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150766 T3

2000-11-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-10-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703103 20001019

2000-10-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19980922;LT PAYMENT 19980922;LV PAYMENT 19980922;RO PAYMENT 19980922;SI PAYMENT 19980922

2000-09-13 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-09-13 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-09-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 196378 T 20000915

2000-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIGITALL INC

2000-05-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PANZERI, EZIO

2000-05-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: AL-HASHEMI, BURHAN

2000-03-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07D 5/02 A

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990318

1999-03-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980922

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 980922;LT PAYMENT 980922;LV PAYMENT 980922;RO PAYMENT 980922;SI PAYMENT 980922