Global Patent Index - EP 0900531 A3

EP 0900531 A3 2000-09-06 - Footwear and method of making the same

Title (en)

Footwear and method of making the same

Title (de)

Schuhwerk und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung

Title (fr)

Article chaussant et procédé de fabrication d'un tel article

Publication

EP 0900531 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98116617 A

Priority

DE 19738744 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0900531A2] The upper (13) comprises an outer (23), with inner lining (25), each with separate string-drawn construction. The lining is water tight yet vapor permeable. The lining string (45) overlaps that (43) of the outer. Inside, a filler (21) covers the inner region of the tread (17). It also covers the inward projection of the strung liner. It waterproofs and/or cushions the sole regions. An Independent claim is included for the corresponding sealing method. Preferred features: A similar design is at least partially devoid of separate inner sole, with the same string-drawn construction. The lining projects above the tread-covering material end region, at least in the strung region. At the ends of upper and lining, there are cord tubes (43,45) covered by waterproofing and/or cushioning material. A single cord may be used in both tubes, in which case it leaves just to the rear of the sole ground contact region, to cross over mutually, internally and between sides of the shoe, being knotted in this region (not shown). The remainder of the upper may be attached by an inner sole (15). In a further variant the entire sole region of the upper is string-drawn. Constructions are further detailed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 7/12; A43B 9/00; A43B 13/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43D 25/06 (2006.01); A43B 7/12 (2006.01); A43B 9/00 (2006.01); A43B 13/18 (2006.01); A43B 13/42 (2006.01); A43D 86/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 9/00 (2013.01); A43B 7/125 (2013.01); A43B 13/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0900531 A2 19990310; EP 0900531 A3 20000906; DE 19738744 A1 19990408; JP H11155610 A 19990615

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010403

2001-06-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI