Global Patent Index - EP 0900594 A3

EP 0900594 A3 2000-04-05 - Plunger type burette for burette system

Title (en)

Plunger type burette for burette system

Title (de)

Kolbenbürette für eine Bürettenanordnung

Title (fr)

Burette à piston pour système de burettage

Publication

EP 0900594 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98116048 A

Priority

DE 19739140 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0900594A2] The cylinder (11) is molded to close tolerances in a plastic containing 10-100% of a cyclo olefin copolymer (COC) and can be interchanged on the burette arrangement. One end of the cylinder is closed by a piston (13) to retain the fluid and a cap seals the outlet during storage of the cylinder and contents. When in use the elastomer cap is removed and replaced by a connector to a metering tube and titrating tip.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01L 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01F 11/28 (2006.01); B01L 3/02 (2006.01); G01N 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01L 3/0206 (2013.01); Y10T 436/119163 (2013.01); Y10T 436/2575 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0900594 A2 19990310; EP 0900594 A3 20000405; DE 19739140 C1 19990408; JP H11166849 A 19990622; US 6207112 B1 20010327

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-12 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030917

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021021

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE DK FR GB LI LU NL SE

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-09 [K1C1] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (TITLE PAGE) PUBLISHED

- Effective date: 19990310

1999-06-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHOTT GLAS

1999-06-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CARL-ZEISS-STIFTUNG TRADING AS SCHOTT GLAS

1999-03-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980911

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FR GB LI LU NL SE

1999-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI