Global Patent Index - EP 0900595 B1

EP 0900595 B1 2001-05-30 - Cutting and separating unit for meat grinders

Title (en)

Cutting and separating unit for meat grinders

Title (de)

Trennschneidsatz für Maschinen zur Fleischzerkleinerung

Title (fr)

Ensemble de coupe et de séparation pour hachoirs à viande

Publication

EP 0900595 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98114691 A

Priority

  • DE 19734611 A
  • US 12819698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19734611C1] A meat mincing machine has a set or sets of cutters which remove given types of residue such as gristle, cartilage, ligaments and bones. The novelty is that: (a) the set of cutters has one or more separation levels; (b) the cutter set has a thick perforated end-disc (8) with a centre dead-end hole (9) from which a radial discharge passage (10) runs to the outside; (c) the surrounding housing (11) has a valve- (13) regulated an opening (12) over the discharge passage (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 18/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 18/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 18/304 (2013.01); B02C 2018/308 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DK ES FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19734611 C1 19990107; DK 0900595 T3 20010924; EP 0900595 A1 19990310; EP 0900595 B1 20010530; ES 2160384 T3 20011101; US 5944267 A 19990831

INPADOC legal status


2009-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070806

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070805

2008-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070806

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-07-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070805

2008-04-21 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2006-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060830

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20060830

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050819

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2160384 T3

2001-09-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-09-24 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2001-08-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DK ES FI FR GB IT SE

2001-05-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2000-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001020

1999-12-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

1999-11-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DK ES FI FR GB IT SE

1999-06-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990408

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DK ES FI FR GB IT SE

1999-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI