Global patent index - EP 0900602 B1

EP 0900602 B1 2000-11-29 - Apparatus for bending steel bars, particularly concrete reinforcing bars

Title (en)

Apparatus for bending steel bars, particularly concrete reinforcing bars

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Biegen von Betonstahl

Title (fr)

Dispositif de cintrage des fers à béton

Publication

EP 0900602 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98830414 A

Priority

IT TO970792 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0900602A1] An apparatus for bending steel bars (9) comprises a base (1) and a bending disk (3) having a central shaft (6) and an eccentric pin (7) and further cooperating with an abutment element (10) while the bending operation is carried out. The central shaft (6) and the abutment element (10) are shaped in such a way that they are able to exchange their functions with each other when it is necessary to carry out a bending operation in a direction opposite with respect to a previous bending operation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 11/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 11/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 11/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0900602 A1 19990310; EP 0900602 B1 20001129; DE 69800413 D1 20010104; DE 69800413 T2 20010329; ES 2152117 T3 20010116; IT 1294846 B1 19990423; IT TO970792 A1 19990308

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160712

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130710

2014-09-09 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140909

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120824

- Year of fee payment: 15

2001-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2152117

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69800413

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-01-04

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR

1999-11-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990715

1999-06-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990324

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR

1999-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI