Global Patent Index - EP 0900743 A3

EP 0900743 A3 2000-01-12 - A tamper-evident lid

Title (en)

A tamper-evident lid

Title (de)

Originalitätsverschluss

Title (fr)

Couvercle inviolable

Publication

EP 0900743 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98306163 A

Priority

GB 9718849 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0900743A2] A tamper-evident lid for a container, the lid comprising a sheet defining a body of the lid, engagement means for engaging the lid with the container and locking means, connected to the body by a web. The locking means is moveable about the web from a first position in which the container is engaged to a second position in which the container is not engaged and in which the locking means is caused to move from the first position to the second position before the engagement means is disengaged from the container. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 43/10; B65D 43/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 43/02 (2006.01); B65D 43/10 (2006.01); B65D 43/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 43/161 (2013.01); B65D 43/0256 (2013.01); B65D 2101/0023 (2013.01); B65D 2251/105 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00194 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00296 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00527 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00537 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00648 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00685 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00731 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00805 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0900743 A2 19990310; EP 0900743 A3 20000112; GB 9718849 D0 19971112

INPADOC legal status


2001-07-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000713

2000-10-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65D 43/10 A, 7B 65D 43/16 B

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI