Global Patent Index - EP 0900759 B1

EP 0900759 B1 2000-08-09 - Yarn carrier

Title (en)

Yarn carrier

Title (de)

Garnträger

Title (fr)

Support de fil

Publication

EP 0900759 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97115542 A

Priority

EP 97115542 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0900759A1] The bobbin has a yarn catch opening (3) with longitudinal walls aligned radially at right angles to the longitudinal axis, with a larger gap between them than the thickness of the yarn. The yarn catch opening (3) extends from the clamping slit (4) at least to the point where a tangent at the circumference of the bobbin intersects with the deepest point (8) of the clamping slit (4) at the transit to the catch opening (3).The depth of the yarn catch opening (3) extends at least to a theoretical straight line (9), which runs from the start of the catch opening (3) at the circumference of the bobbin to the deepest point (8) of the clamping slit (4) at the transit to the catch opening (3). The catch opening (3) has the same depth overall. The bobbin is in a sleeve structure, and the catch opening (3) is a window in the bobbin wall (6). The yarn catch opening (3) extends over 45-60 of the circumference, and the clamping slit (4) lies over at least 90 of the circumference.The yarn catch opening (3) is tapered at the ends with a smooth transit into the opening which, otherwise, has a constant width of 1.0-2.5 mm. The depth of the clamping slit (4) is about 50% of the bobbin wall (6) thickness. The clamping slit (4) width is 0-0.2 mm at half the height when not pressed together.The bobbin forms a yarn reserve (5) at the catch opening (3) and clamping slit (4) zone.The catch opening (3) and clamping slit (4) are formed by the cuts of a circular blade in the circumference of the bobbin. Or the clamping slit (4) is cut by a circular blade, and the window is stamped out in the bobbin wall (6) for the catch opening (3). PAPER - The bobbin sleeve is of cardboard, and the like.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 75/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 75/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 75/28 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0900759 A1 19990310; EP 0900759 B1 20000809; EP 0900759 B2 20060614; AT 195299 T 20000815; CZ 297942 B6 20070502; CZ 9802783 A3 19990317; DE 59702147 D1 20000914; DK 0900759 T3 20001211; ES 2150726 T3 20001201; GR 3034438 T3 20001229; PL 328340 A1 19990315; SI 900759 T1 20001231; SK 118598 A3 19990611; SK 284753 B6 20051103; TR 9801736 A2 19990322; TR 9801736 A3 19990322; ZA 9808094 B 19990309

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010930

2010-11-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20001001

- Year of fee payment: 6

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080908

2009-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-06-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SONOCO IPD G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20080930

2008-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070921

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071127

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070927

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070917

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-11-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070924

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-05-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-10-02 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2006-10-02 [NLR4] NL: RECEIPT OF CORRECTED TRANSLATION IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AT THE INITIATIVE OF THE PROPRIETOR OF THE PATENT

2006-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20020909

2006-08-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20060614

2006-07-14 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2006-07-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-06-14 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20060614

2006-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL

2006-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: LV SI

2006-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2005-09-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050908

2004-10-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20041022

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041019

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-06-01 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20031011

2003-07-09 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-04-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020908

2003-04-28 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2003-04-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030404

2002-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020909

2002-09-09 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020909

2002-09-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020908

2002-09-08 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020908

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-27 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20010927

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-09-24 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20010924

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-09-21 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20010921

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-09-20 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010920

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-08-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010807

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: FRIES PLANUNGS- UND MARKETINGGESELLSCHAFT M.B.H

2001-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: AHLSTROM SIBILLE TUBES SA

2001-06-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: FRIES PLANUNGS- UND MARKETINGGESELLSCHAFT M.B.H

- Effective date: 20010322

2001-06-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: AHLSTROM SIBILLE TUBES SA

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-05-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: FRIES PLANUNGS- UND MARKETINGGESELLSCHAFT M.B.H

- Effective date: 20010322

2000-12-11 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-12-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001113

2000-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150726 T3

2000-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: STRAHLBERG & PARTNERS

2000-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702147 20000914

2000-09-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-08-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DR. ING. AUSSERER ANTON

2000-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LV PAYMENT 19990504;SI PAYMENT 19990504

2000-08-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195299 T 20000815

1999-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991019

1999-11-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL

1999-11-24 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: LV PAYMENT 19990504;SI PAYMENT 19990504

1999-07-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990504

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL