Global Patent Index - EP 0900854 B1

EP 0900854 B1 2001-05-30 - Condensate retention arrangement for cold hearth refining

Title (en)

Condensate retention arrangement for cold hearth refining

Title (de)

Kondensatauffanganordnung für Schmelzbehandlung in Kaltherdofen

Title (fr)

Collecteur du condensé pour four d'affinage à creuset froid

Publication

EP 0900854 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98202473 A

Priority

US 92320197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0900854A1] In the condensate retention arrangement for cold hearth refining described in the specification, a member (26, 40) having a concave water-cooled surface (22, 34) is disposed above a hearth (12) to collect condensate (25) of vaporized constituents of an alloy being processed in the hearth. The condensate (25) collected on the water-cooled surface is less brittle and less likely to break away and fall into the hearth (12) which could change the composition of the refined material. The member (26, 40) having the concave surface may be the lid of an enclosure (10) containing the hearth or a separate member disposed above the hearth. Dovetail retention grooves (36) may be formed in the surface (34) facing the hearth to enhance retention of the condensate. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22B 9/22; C22B 34/12; F27D 1/02; F27D 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22B 9/02 (2006.01); C22B 9/22 (2006.01); C22B 34/12 (2006.01); F27B 3/24 (2006.01); F27D 1/02 (2006.01); F27D 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22B 9/228 (2013.01); C22B 34/1295 (2013.01); F27D 1/025 (2013.01); F27D 1/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0900854 A1 19990310; EP 0900854 B1 20010530; DE 69800856 D1 20010705; DE 69800856 T2 20020912; JP 3076306 B2 20000814; JP H11132664 A 19990521

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130723

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130723

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-04-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69800856

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130723

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120718

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120717

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120719

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120718

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

2001-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800856 20010705

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000216

1999-11-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-03-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990121

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI