Global patent index - EP 0900867 A3

EP 0900867 A3 2000-01-26 - Method for making knitwear on a flat bed knitting machine

Title (en)

Method for making knitwear on a flat bed knitting machine

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Gestrickes auf einer Flachstrickmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication d'un tricot dans un métier à tricoter rectiligne

Publication

EP 0900867 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98114785 A

Priority

DE 19738213 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0900867A2] To knit a fabric on a flatbed knitter, with at least two needle beds, the knitted material (10) has zones (12) with outer and visible edges. A pattern of repeated colored lateral strips (13,14) is at least in these zones (12). The initial and final rows of stitches for a colored strip (13,14) are each knitted only on one needle bed. The yarn is laid to float over some needles at the knitted edge. The final row of a strip and the first row of the next strip are knitted on the same needle bed and in the same knitting direction. At the floating yarn sections, the yarn is knitted by only every second needle.The yarn loop (15,16) between the final row of one colored strip (13,14) and the first row of the next strip (14,13), in the same color, is pulled out at the edge and cut to a short length. After cutting, the yarn retracts by its own elasticity into the fabric, out of sight.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/126 (2013.01); D04B 1/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0900867 A2 19990310; EP 0900867 A3 20000126; EP 0900867 B1 20030319; DE 19738213 A1 19990304; DE 19738213 B4 20051124; ES 2190014 T3 20030716

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080806

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070723

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20050808

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 09

2005-08-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050808

2004-08-04 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040804

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-03-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2190014

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): ES IT

2000-11-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): ES IT

2000-11-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): ES IT

1999-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI