Global Patent Index - EP 0900868 A3

EP 0900868 A3 2000-01-19 - Method for making knitwear on a flat bed knitting machine

Title (en)

Method for making knitwear on a flat bed knitting machine

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Gestrickes auf einer Flachstrickmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication d'un tricot dans un métier à tricoter rectiligne

Publication

EP 0900868 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98107237 A

Priority

DE 19738214 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0900868A2] To knit a fabric on a flatbed knitter, with two opposing needle beds and a stitch transfer system, the knitted fabric (10) has a ground fabric (11) and at least one parallel knitted section (12) covering the ground fabric (11) at least partially, formed by at least two knitted fabrics (14,15) on parallel planes. At least at a section of at least one fabric section (12), at max. every other needle of one needle bed is occupied by a stitch of the ground fabric (11) and the facing needle of the other needle bed is empty. One of the knitted pieces (14,15) of the parallel section (12) is produced on the opposite needle bed to the one producing the ground fabric (11), and the other parallel section is formed at the empty needles of the needle bed used for the ground fabric. The parallel knitted piece (12) is bonded to the ground fabric (11) at least at one point, and the two sections (14,15) of the parallel piece (12) are at least partially bonded together.To form the parallel sections (14,15) behind the ground fabric (11), a row of ground fabric (11) stitches are formed on the leading needle bed, and all the stitches of the first section (14) are transferred from the trailing needle bed to the empty needles of the leading bed. A row of stitches for the first section (14) is formed at the leading bed, and a row of stitches for the other section (15) is formed at the trailing bed. The stitches of the first section (14) are transferred from the leading bed to the trailing bed, and the process is repeated to give the two sections (14,15) their required length.To transfer the sections (14,15) from the rear side of the ground fabric (11) to the front side, the stitches of the first section (14) are transferred from the leading bed to the stitches of the ground fabric (11), and a row of stitches for the ground fabric (11) is formed on the leading bed and at the section of the parallel piece (12) on the trailing bed. Initial rows for a new pair of sections (14,15) are formed at the leading bed or at the empty needles of the trailing bed. A row of stitches is knitted at the leading bed, and the stitches of the second piece (15) are transferred to the empty needles of the leading bed. A row of stitches is knitted for the ground fabric (11) and a row of stitches is formed for the second piece (15) at the trailing bed, with a row of stitches knitted for the first piece (14) at the leading bed. The stitches for the second piece (15) are transferred to the empty needles of the leading bed, and a row of ground fabric (11) stitches is knitted at the trailing bed. The process is repeated to the required length of the parallel piece (12).Where the parallel piece is a knitted material with a Jacquard pattern, the initial row for the ground fabric is knitted at the trailing bed. The stitches of the second piece are transferred to the empty needles of the trailing bed. The stitches of the first piece are knitted in the ground color of the Jacquard pattern at the leading bed, and the yarns are combined with the second piece at the trailing bed. The stitches for the first piece, in the second Jacquard pattern color, are knitted at the leading bed, and the yarns are combined with the second piece at the trailing bed. The stitches of the second piece are transferred to the leading bed. The process is repeated to give the required Jacquard pattern length.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/22 (2013.01); D10B 2501/061 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0900868 A2 19990310; EP 0900868 A3 20000119; EP 0900868 B1 20030730; CN 1108407 C 20030514; CN 1210160 A 19990310; DE 19738214 A1 19990304; ES 2200234 T3 20040301; US 6065311 A 20000523

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070421

2006-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050422

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-04-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050422

2004-07-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-04-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040426

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040331

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2200234 T3

2003-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809141 P 20030904

2003-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES IT

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

1999-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI