Global Patent Index - EP 0900879 B1

EP 0900879 B1 2002-11-06 - Apparatus for scraping or/and dosing a fluid or pasty material on a moving working surface

Title (en)

Apparatus for scraping or/and dosing a fluid or pasty material on a moving working surface

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Abstreifen oder/und Dosieren eines flüssigen bis pastösen Mediums auf einer sich vorbeibewegenden Arbeitsfläche.

Title (fr)

Appareil pour racler ou/et doser un matériau fluide ou pâteux sur une surface de travail en mouvement

Publication

EP 0900879 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98114123 A

Priority

DE 19738356 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0900879A1] The applicator system to spread a liquid to paste medium, on a moving web surface, has part of the compensation unit (21) in the force flow path between the doctor carrier (15) and the doctor components (7,9) to compensate for the distortion of the doctor carrier (15) in relation to the moving web (3), so that the doctor pressure is unaffected by the distortion. The compensation unit has a fluid and especially pneumatic action, with a force unit (37) and a surface (57) subjected to a pressure medium for transmission to the doctor components (7,9), independently of the distortion at the doctor carrier (15). The pressure medium supply (25) sets and maintains a constant pressure through the medium at the surface (57). The force is applied by a piston/cylinder unit (37) with a cylinder housing (39) and a piston assembly with at least one piston (45) moving in the hollow zone (41) of the housing (39). A pressure chamber (29) is linked to the pressure medium supply (25). A compensating membrane (53) is held at the cylinder housing (39) round its edge to separate the pressure chamber (29) in the hollow zone (41) in a pressure seal, to form the surface (57) under pressure on the side towards the pressure chamber, and in contact with at least one piston (45). The cylinder housing (39) is at the doctor carrier (15), and at least one piston (45) is coupled to the doctor components (7,9) for a common shifting movement. The piston (45) forms a dedicated component for one of the doctor components (7,9), with a release mechanical coupling, especially in pressure contact with the doctor components (7,9). The piston (45) is not guided, however is in a stabilized position and especially in a positive fit with the doctor components (7,9). The pressure chamber (29) extends coherently across the whole width of the web (3). The membrane (53) is a longitudinal strip membrane, to apply the pressure from the pressure chamber (29) together with a number of pistons (45) distributed across the web (3) width. Or a number of separate pressure chambers are across the web (3) width, each with a circular pressure transfer membrane. A given pressure is set at the pressure chamber(s), independently of each other. The doctor components (7,9) are a doctor bed (9) and a rotating doctor rod (7). The doctor carrier (15) has a longitudinal doctor beam (17) to support the doctor bed (9), especially with a leaf spring (11) assembly.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 25/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21H 25/08 (2006.01); D21H 25/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 25/08 (2013.01); B05C 11/042 (2013.01); D21H 25/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0900879 A1 19990310; EP 0900879 B1 20021106; AT 227378 T 20021115; DE 19738356 A1 19990304; DE 59806166 D1 20021212; US 6149726 A 20001121

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090730

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090729

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2010-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090729

2010-03-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-02-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080714

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080715

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20080715

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-08-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806166 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR IT SE

2002-11-06 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227378 T 20021115

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010228

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-01-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECHNIK PATENT GMBH

1999-11-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FI FR IT SE

1999-11-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990910

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR IT SE

1999-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI