Global Patent Index - EP 0900881 A3

EP 0900881 A3 2000-06-14 - Building element,-assembly, -set or building for noise protection- and/or support structures

Title (en)

Building element,-assembly, -set or building for noise protection- and/or support structures

Title (de)

Bauteil, Baugruppe, Bauteilsatz oder Bauwerk für Schallschutz- und/oder Stützkonstruktionen

Title (fr)

Elément de construction, -ensemble, -série ou construction pour ouvrage anti-bruit et/ou support

Publication

EP 0900881 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98117102 A

Priority

DE 19739606 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0900881A2] The construction material has acoustic protection surface (SO) which, at least in sections, has a coarse structure (QP) of alternating peaks (H) and valleys (T) at intervals in the cm range. It gives a fine gap structure (FS) with gap intervals and/or depths in a mm range or smaller. The acoustic protection zone has light concrete, in at least part of its vol., with a pore or bubble structure and/or with finely distributed light additives.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01F 8/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 8/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 8/0029 (2013.01); E01F 8/0017 (2013.01); E01F 8/0023 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0900881 A2 19990310; EP 0900881 A3 20000614; DE 19739606 A1 19990401

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001215

2001-03-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI