Global Patent Index - EP 0900892 A3

EP 0900892 A3 2000-11-02 - Foldable panel

Title (en)

Foldable panel

Title (de)

Faltbares Plattenelement

Title (fr)

Panneau pliable

Publication

EP 0900892 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98115203 A

Priority

DE 29715787 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0900892A2] The panels have a refined visible surface and are connected together by a folding hinge (3) made of a flexible band (6) which is stuck on the opposing longitudinal edges (8) of the panels (2) so that the hinge axis (9) lies in the plane of the visible faces (4) of the panels. The band can also be fixed on the reverse faces (5) of the panels adjoining the longitudinal edges. The longitudinal edges of the panels run at right angles to the visible faces. The refined visible faces can be formed by a continuous foil covering the hinge seam.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 2/40; A47B 96/20; E04B 1/61; E04B 2/72; E04B 2/82; E05D 1/02; G09F 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 96/20 (2006.01); E04B 1/61 (2006.01); E04B 2/72 (2006.01); E04B 2/82 (2006.01); E05D 1/02 (2006.01); G09F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 96/202 (2013.01); E04B 1/6108 (2013.01); E04B 2/72 (2013.01); E04B 2/825 (2013.01); E05D 1/02 (2013.01); G09F 15/0068 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/13 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/60 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29715787 U1 19971016; EP 0900892 A2 19990310; EP 0900892 A3 20001102; PL 108565 U1 19990315

INPADOC legal status


2002-02-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010503

2001-08-23 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04C 2/40 A, 7A 47B 96/20 B, 7E 04B 1/61 B, 7E 04B 2/72 B, 7E 04B 2/82 B, 7E 05D 1/02 B, 7G 09F 15/00 B

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT

1999-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI