Global Patent Index - EP 0900898 A3

EP 0900898 A3 2002-09-04 - Spot footing

Title (en)

Spot footing

Title (de)

Stützfuss

Title (fr)

Pied de support

Publication

EP 0900898 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98202944 A

Priority

FI 973622 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0900898A2] Spot footing especially designed for the attachment of a precast concrete or wooden pillar to a foundation and for the extension of such a pillar, said spot footing comprising a bottom plate (3) and a protective casing with a top plate (2) and a partially open side wall part (4), the main dowel bar (1) of the spot footing being attached to the top plate (2). The side wall part (4) of the protective casing is a cylindrical structure of a circular cross-section with one side open, and the bottom and top plates are of a circular shape and their diameters are substantially equal to the diameter of the cross-section of the cylindrical side wall part. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 12/22; E04B 1/21

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/21 (2006.01); E02D 27/12 (2006.01); E02D 27/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/215 (2013.01); E02D 27/12 (2013.01); E02D 27/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0900898 A2 19990310; EP 0900898 A3 20020904; EP 0900898 B1 20050119; AT 287483 T 20050215; DE 69828667 D1 20050224; DE 69828667 T2 20060316; ES 2235286 T3 20050701; FI 104747 B 20000331; FI 973622 A0 19970908; FI 973622 A 19990309

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171025

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170926

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170928

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170928

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-09-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: ANSTAR OY, FI

- Document: AT 287483 T

- Effective date: 20161005

2016-10-14 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ANSTAR OY, FI

- Effective date: 20160912

2016-10-05 [REG NL PD] CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP

- Owner name: ANSTAR OY; FI

- Free text: DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: VERANDERING VAN EIGENAAR(S), OVERDRACHT; FORMER OWNER NAME: TARTUNTAMARKKINOINTI OY

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-08 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ANSTAR OY, FI

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: TARTUNTAMARKKINOINTI OY, VILLAEHDE, FI

- Document: DE 69828667

2016-09-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69828667

- Representative's name: FROHWITTER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

2016-09-07 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20160811 AND 20160817

2016-08-10 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: ANSTAR OY

- Effective date: 20160804

2016-07-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ANSTAR OY, FI

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: TARTUNTAMARKKINOINTI OY, FI

2015-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120903

2012-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20111227

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050619

2006-06-14 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-01-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051020

2005-11-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-09-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-05 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050905

2005-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2235286 T3

2005-04-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050419

2005-04-05 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2005-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69828667 P 20050224

2005-02-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2005-01-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030710

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04H 12/22 A, 7E 04B 1/21 B

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI