Global Patent Index - EP 0900904 A3

EP 0900904 A3 2000-06-28 - Hinge for container covers

Title (en)

Hinge for container covers

Title (de)

Scharnier für Behälterabdeckungen

Title (fr)

Charnière pour couvertures de conteneur

Publication

EP 0900904 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98113420 A

Priority

DE 19738931 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19738931C1] The hinge system consists of a bracket (20) with which it is attached to the container and a bracket (30) with which it is attached to the cover (110). The hinge incorporates a first (40) and a second lever (50) which can pivot about parallel axes (42,44,52,54) from door bracket (20) and from container bracket (30). The distances between pivot points of the two levers are equal. The pivot axes (42,52) on the container bracket (20) have a distance from one another which is smaller than the distance between the other pivot points (44,54). The pivot axes of the levers is arranged so, that the vertical distance of the pivot (44) from the mounting face (32), of the cover, is larger than the distance of the pivot (42) to the mounting face (22) in the container.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 3/06; E05F 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 3/06 (2006.01); E05D 3/14 (2006.01); E05F 1/12 (2006.01); E05F 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 3/142 (2013.01); E05F 1/1269 (2013.01); E05F 1/14 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19738931 C1 19981022; EP 0900904 A2 19990310; EP 0900904 A3 20000628

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001229

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

2000-07-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 05D 3/06 A, 7E 05F 1/12 B, 7E 05D 11/00 B

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

1999-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI