Global Patent Index - EP 0900932 B1

EP 0900932 B1 2002-09-11 - Fuel injection system for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Fuel injection system for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzanlage für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Système d'injection de combustible pour un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0900932 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98110449 A

Priority

DE 19738397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0900932A1] The fuel injection system includes a dual fuel injection nozzle (12), with a pressure chamber (11) where fuel and an addition fluid are alternating supplied. A valve arrangement, has a controllable high-pressure fuel supply to the dual fuel injection nozzle. The connection of the pressure room with a low-pressure side and with an inlet conductor (26) of the additional fluid are also controllable. The valve arrangement includes a switching valve (16) which is formed, both for the control of the supply of the pressure chamber with high or low pressure, as well as for the control of the filling of the pressure chamber with the additional fluid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 43/04; F02M 47/02; F02M 59/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 25/00 (2006.01); F02D 19/08 (2006.01); F02M 25/022 (2006.01); F02M 37/00 (2006.01); F02M 43/00 (2006.01); F02M 43/04 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/0007 (2013.01); F02M 43/04 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 63/0047 (2013.01); F02M 63/0049 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0900932 A1 19990310; EP 0900932 B1 20020911; DE 19738397 A1 19990318; JP H11148436 A 19990602; US 5979410 A 19991109

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2007-08-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070828

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-06-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050608

2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-02-03 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030608

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030609

2003-06-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030608

2003-03-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805489 20021017

2002-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCINTILLA AG, DIREKTION

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010212

1999-11-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1999-11-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990910

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1999-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI