Global Patent Index - EP 0900973 A3

EP 0900973 A3 2000-12-13 - Vehicle headlamp

Title (en)

Vehicle headlamp

Title (de)

Scheinwerfer für Fahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Projecteur pour véhicule

Publication

EP 0900973 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98116560 A

Priority

DE 19739114 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0900973A2] The floodlight comprises a separate blind (6), arranged between a light element and a light disk, and comprises at least one carrying arm (7) led through an aperture of a reflector. A radial outward directed end section of the carrying arm is a plug (8) arranged with its side facing the reflector in a plug recording (11) formed at the reflector rear side, and which is held in the plug recording. The floodlight comprises a reflector (1), light disk (2) covering the reflector, and a light element (4) inserted in an aperture (3) of the reflector. A blind (6) formed as a separate part, is arranged between the light element and the light disk, and comprises at least one carrying arm (7) which is led through the aperture of the reflector. The carrying arm borders with a radial outward directed end section at a plot surface area (9) of the reflector rear side, and is clamped between a holder ring (10) and the reflector rear side. The radial outward directed end section of the carrying arm is a plug part (8) which is arranged with its side facing the reflector in a plug recording (11) formed at the reflector rear side, and which is held in the plug recording.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21M 7/00; F21M 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 11/16 (2006.01); F21V 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/145 (2013.01); F21S 48/142 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0900973 A2 19990310; EP 0900973 A3 20001213; BR 9803964 A 19991116; DE 19739114 A1 19990311

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-04 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20051110

2004-11-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-09-05 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 19980910

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010321

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 19980910

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 980910