Global Patent Index - EP 0900974 A3

EP 0900974 A3 2001-01-17 - Bulb mounting in a reflector aperture for a vehicle headlamp

Title (en)

Bulb mounting in a reflector aperture for a vehicle headlamp

Title (de)

Halterung einer Lampe in einer Öffnung eines Reflektors eines Fahrzeugscheinwerfers

Title (fr)

Support de lampe dans une ouverture de réflecteur de phare

Publication

EP 0900974 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98116701 A

Priority

DE 19739117 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0900974A2] The fixture comprises a collar (3) surrounding an aperture of a reflector (2), and a holder ring (4) put on the collar (3) and fixed through hook-like splint elements (6) at a side of the collar. A plot surface is formed by at least two plot elements (8) of the reflector, between which at least respectively one hook-like splint element is arranged.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21M 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/1118 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0900974 A2 19990310; EP 0900974 A3 20010117; DE 19739117 A1 19990311

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-04 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20051110

2004-11-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-10-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 19980910

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010615

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 19980910

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 980910