Global Patent Index - EP 0900989 A3

EP 0900989 A3 2001-03-28 - Radiator valve

Title (en)

Radiator valve

Title (de)

Heizkörperventil

Title (fr)

Robinet pour radiateur

Publication

EP 0900989 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98202921 A

Priority

DE 19739109 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0900989A2] The protective cap is fixed on the housing and covers the operating device. The torque engagement surface arrangement (6) in relation to the screw-in direction, projects radially over the protective cap (11). The protective cap at each position in a peripheral direction locates radially within the torque engagement surface arrangement (6). The protective cap activates the operating device (9) when fixed to the housing (3). It is screwed into position. The operating device is a pin and the protective cap is formed as a cup with a reinforced base (14) in the area of the pin, having a cylindrical outer shape. Additionally, an adjustment device (17) is provided and the protective cap has the role of an adjustment tool.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24D 19/10; F24H 9/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16K 31/64 (2006.01); F24D 19/10 (2006.01); F24H 9/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24D 19/0002 (2013.01); F24D 19/1015 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] DE 9415298 U1 19941201 - SCHLOESSER GMBH ARMATURENFABRI [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0900989 A2 19990310; EP 0900989 A3 20010328; DE 19739109 A1 19990325; DE 19739109 C2 20000420

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020403

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB IT SE

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010412

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT SE

1999-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI