Global Patent Index - EP 0900990 A3

EP 0900990 A3 2000-07-19 - Air curtain device pass

Title (en)

Air curtain device pass

Title (de)

Durchgangsluftschleieranlage

Title (fr)

Passage à rideau d'air

Publication

EP 0900990 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98114637 A

Priority

DE 19738535 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0900990A2] The air current emerges from flow guides (3)parallel to the dividing plane in an upper limit and at least one lateral limit of the through passage aperture. The air current is produced by axial fans (8) arranged in the flow guides. The air current comprises two part jets (1a,1b) being taken from the respective rooms (5,6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 9/00 (2013.01); F24F 2009/007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0900990 A2 19990310; EP 0900990 A3 20000719; EP 0900990 B1 20031119; DE 19738535 A1 19990304

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060428

2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050804

2006-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2005-08-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050804

2004-11-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-08-18 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040818

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040809

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-05 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040805

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-07-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040730

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810210 P 20031224

2003-12-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2003-11-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GERHARDT, HANS-JOACHIM, PROF. M.SC.

2003-11-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FIEDLER, ECKEHARD, DR.-ING.

2003-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021016

2002-07-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GERHARDT, HANS JOACHIM, PROF. DIPL.-ING.

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB NL

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1999-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI