Global patent index - EP 0900995 A3

EP 0900995 A3 2000-01-12 - A dart target with a cursor displacement step counting display.

Title (en)

A dart target with a cursor displacement step counting display.

Title (de)

Pfeilzielscheibe mit einer Anzeigevorrichtung der Cursor-Verschiebungen

Title (fr)

Cible pour fléchettes comportant un système d'affichage des déplacements d'un curseur

Publication

EP 0900995 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98202376 A

Priority

US 92555597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0900995A2] A dart target with a cursor displacement step-counting display device includes a target (10) divided into several sectors each represents a corresponding score designated by a number for movement steps of a cursor, a key region (15) adapted to the target (10) for setting players and playing modes, a plurality of lights for illustrating game modes and players, a main controller (30) for outputting signals related to the cursor movement step and to record the cursor position, and a cursor displacement step-counting display comprising a plurality of lights for cooperating with the main controller (30) in order to move a cursor during the plurality of lights and to record the cursor position as a start point for a subsequent movement. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41J 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41J 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41J 3/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0900995 A2 19990310; EP 0900995 A3 20000112

INPADOC legal status

2001-07-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010201

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE ES FR GB NL

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000207

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7F 41J 3/02 A

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB NL

1999-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI