Global Patent Index - EP 0901108 A3

EP 0901108 A3 2001-03-21 - Franking machine

Title (en)

Franking machine

Title (de)

Frankiermaschine

Title (fr)

Machine à affranchir

Publication

EP 0901108 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98250280 A

Priority

DE 29716523 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0901108A2] The printing unit provides a franking pattern on the edge Ä31Ü of an envelope Ä3Ü that is moved by a feed conveyor Ä10Ü along the surface of a guide plate Ä2Ü. An ink jet printing module Ä12Ü is positioned directly onto the plate and in line with this are actuator Ä12Ü units that maintain the letter in contact with guide plate. A sensor Ä17Ü is set into the plate and detect the position of the letters. A pressure sensor Ä7Ü identifies a feed blockage. The conveyor is driven by a motor built into one of the rollers Ä11Ü.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 13/00 (2006.01); B41J 13/12 (2006.01); G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 13/0027 (2013.01); B41J 13/12 (2013.01); G07B 17/00467 (2013.01); G07B 17/00661 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00669 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29716523 U1 19971120; DE 59813539 D1 20060622; EP 0901108 A2 19990310; EP 0901108 A3 20010321; EP 0901108 B1 20060517; US 6247774 B1 20010619

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: GARTENSTRASSE 28 A, 5400 BADEN (CH)

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160706

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-05-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH, 16547 BIRKENWERDER, DE

- Document: DE 59813539

- Effective date: 20150330

2013-05-08 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59813539

- Effective date: 20130314

2013-04-10 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20130319

2011-09-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

- Free text: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH#TRIFTWEG 21-26#16547 BIRKENWERDER (DE) -TRANSFER TO- FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH#TRIFTWEG 21-26#16547 BIRKENWERDER (DE)

2007-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070220

2006-12-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-09-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060815

2006-06-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59813539 P 20060622

2006-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2006-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2006-05-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

2004-02-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031230

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010726

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI