Global patent index - EP 0901109 A3

EP 0901109 A3 2001-03-14 - System for handling mail with a franking and address printing machine and method for combined franking and address printing

Title (en)

System for handling mail with a franking and address printing machine and method for combined franking and address printing

Title (de)

Postbearbeitungssystem mit einer Frankier- und Adressiermaschine und Verfahren zum Kombinierten Frankier- und Adressendruck

Title (fr)

Système de traitement de courrier avec une machine d'affranchissement et d'adressage et procédé pour combiner l'affranchissement et l'adressage

Publication

EP 0901109 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98250281 A

Priority

DE 19740397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0901109A2] The mail handling system uses a digital printer (20) with a single printing head for addressing and franking each letter (3) during successive printing cycles, with rotation of the letter through 180 degrees between the latter, the control signals for the printing head provided by a control device which is switched from the addressing mode into the franking mode upon operation of the letter rotation device (40).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/00; B41J 13/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 13/12 (2006.01); G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 13/12 (2013.01); G07B 17/00467 (2013.01); G07B 17/00508 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00564 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00596 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0901109 A2 19990310; EP 0901109 A3 20010314; DE 19740397 A1 19990311; US 6389327 B1 20020514

INPADOC legal status

2004-09-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040302

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010714

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 07B 17/00 A, 7B 41J 13/12 B

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI