Global Patent Index - EP 0901110 A3

EP 0901110 A3 2000-09-13 - Method for operating a cash terminal and such cash terminal

Title (en)

Method for operating a cash terminal and such cash terminal

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Brtrieb eines Kassenterminals und Kassenterminal

Title (fr)

Méthode d'operation d'un terminal distributeur de monnaie et un tel terminal

Publication

EP 0901110 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98250301 A

Priority

DE 19739459 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0901110A2] Coins are fed from below from at least one coin container (2) up to an outlet (21) above the coin container(s). Coins are entered into and output from the containers, so that they are circulated in common coin containers in the terminal

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 1/02 (2006.01); G07D 9/00 (2006.01); G07D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 1/02 (2013.01); G07D 9/00 (2013.01); G07D 11/0087 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0901110 A2 19990310; EP 0901110 A3 20000913; AU 725879 B2 20001026; AU 8195598 A 19990318; CA 2246383 A1 19990303; DE 19739459 A1 19990304; DE 19739459 C2 20000413; US 6086471 A 20000711; ZA 9807947 B 19990325

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050301

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCAN COIN INDUSTRIES AB

2001-07-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010222

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI