Global Patent Index - EP 0901192 A3

EP 0901192 A3 2000-05-17 - Plug contact

Title (en)

Plug contact

Title (de)

Kontakstecker

Title (fr)

Contact à fiche

Publication

EP 0901192 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98115792 A

Priority

DE 19738654 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0901192A2] The contact plug (10) has knife contacts (12.1,12.2), releasably secured in an insulating housing (11), by insertion of a strip (14) integral with each knife contact in a corresponding pocket, or behind a corresponding retaining projection (20), provided by the insulating housing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/41

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/41 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/41 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] EP 0596338 A2 19940511 - MOLEX INC [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0901192 A2 19990310; EP 0901192 A3 20000517; DE 19738654 A1 19990311

INPADOC legal status


2001-08-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001118

2001-03-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HARMAN AUDIO ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI