Global Patent Index - EP 0901208 A3

EP 0901208 A3 2000-09-27 - Link for a variable cabling system, in particular for Networks

Title (en)

Link for a variable cabling system, in particular for Networks

Title (de)

Link für ein variables Verkabelungssystem, insbesondere für Netzwerke

Title (fr)

Liaison pour un système de câblage, en particulier pour des réseaux

Publication

EP 0901208 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98115639 A

Priority

DE 29714941 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0901208A2] The link has at least two connection modules/units (30,50) with a compensating or compensated plate with an input/out and inputs and outputs and a screened housing (51). It does not matter of the input/output port is used as an input or an output. A flexible connection cable (40) is provided for connecting the connection modules/units (30,50). The link also includes a flexible terminal cable (20,60) for connecting data transmission devices. The central unit connector cable and/or the device connector cable and/or the connection cable is preferably between 1 and 7.5 metres long. This cable may have screened plugs on both ends.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02G 3/00; H01R 31/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 31/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 31/065 (2013.01); H01R 2201/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] WO 9623340 A1 19960801 - HAWORTH INC [US], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29714941 U1 19971218; EP 0901208 A2 19990310; EP 0901208 A3 20000927

INPADOC legal status


2001-09-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010301

2001-07-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 02G 3/00 A, 7H 01R 31/06 B

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI