Global Patent Index - EP 0901246 A3

EP 0901246 A3 2001-12-05 - Method and receiver for the reception of digitally coded messages, such as traffic messages, using the Radio Data System

Title (en)

Method and receiver for the reception of digitally coded messages, such as traffic messages, using the Radio Data System

Title (de)

Verfahren und Empfänger zum Empfang von digital codierten Meldungen, wie zum Beispiel Verkehrsdurchsagen, mit Verwendung des Radiodatensystems

Title (fr)

Méthode et récepteur pour la réception de signaux numériques codés, comme par exemple des informations routières, utilisant le système RDS

Publication

EP 0901246 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98114628 A

Priority

DE 19739257 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0901246A2] The reception method, for digitally-coded messages provided by at least one transmitter, uses a local table stored in a memory (17) at the receiver for decoding the messages, with verification that the required part of the local table for decoding the message is present, to allow a request to be transmitted to the service provider for transmission of the required part of the local table, with updating of the table stored at the receiver.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00; G08G 1/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/09 (2006.01); H04H 20/55 (2008.01); H04H 60/91 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 60/91 (2013.01); G08G 1/092 (2013.01); H04H 20/55 (2013.01); H04H 2201/13 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0901246 A2 19990310; EP 0901246 A3 20011205; EP 0901246 B1 20070523; DE 19739257 A1 19990311; DE 59814011 D1 20070705

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140901

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140804

2015-05-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150430

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140804

2015-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140804

2014-07-03 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 59814011

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: H04H0001000000

- IPC: H04H0020530000

- Effective date: 20140527

2014-07-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59814011

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-05-27 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 59814011

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: H04H0001000000

- IPC: H04H0020530000

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59814011

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130823

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130823

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130820

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121024

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-04-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080226

2007-11-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-09-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070821

2007-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59814011 P 20070705

2007-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-05-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040512

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020605

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI