Global Patent Index - EP 0901313 A3

EP 0901313 A3 2000-11-22 - Dimmersystem

Title (en)

Dimmersystem

Title (de)

Dimmersystem

Title (fr)

Système gradateur

Publication

EP 0901313 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98113763 A

Priority

DE 19738857 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0901313A2] The dimmer system (1) for an electric light (5) has three main parts. A master dimmer (2) is connected to a slave dimmer (3). The third main part is a control module (7). The two dimmers contain a capacitance or loading module (4), and have connections to the main power supply (L,N). The control module is connected to the mains and to an installation bus circuit (9).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 37/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 37/02 (2006.01); H05B 39/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 37/0254 (2013.01); H05B 39/048 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0901313 A2 19990310; EP 0901313 A3 20001122; EP 0901313 B1 20040929; AT 278312 T 20041015; DE 19738857 A1 19990415; NO 984072 A 19990308; NO 984072 D0 19980904

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160713

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-18 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59812020

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ABB PATENT G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20130731

2012-12-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120720

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110725

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-04-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070201

2007-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2005-09-30 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-09-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-07-14 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050714

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-27 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040929

2005-01-11 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-12-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041229

2004-11-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59812020 P 20041104

2004-10-27 [REG GB ERR] ERRATUM

- Free text: NOTIFICATION RECEIVED FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE THAT THE PUBLICATION LANGUAGE IS ACTUALLY GERMAN.

2004-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB LI NL SE

2004-09-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-09-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040929

2004-09-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040929

2004-09-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CLEVER, GERHARD, DIPL.-ING.

2004-09-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ULBRICH, STEFAN, DIPL.-ING.

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB PATENT GMBH

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB LI NL SE

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010222

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB LI NL SE

1999-03-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI