Global Patent Index - EP 0901329 B1

EP 0901329 B1 2001-12-05 - TOOTHBRUSH

Title (en)

TOOTHBRUSH

Title (de)

ZAHNBÜRSTE

Title (fr)

BROSSE A DENTS

Publication

EP 0901329 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97915250 A

Priority

  • CH 9700150 W
  • CH 114596 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9741753A1] The bristle section (2) of the toothbrush connected to a handle comprises two brush heads (4, 5) disposed one behind the other in the longitudinal direction of the toothbrush. Each brush head comprises a bristle carrier (6) with bristles projecting therefrom. The two brush heads (4, 5) are angled towards each other about an axis extending transversely to the longitudinal axis of the toothbrush, the two brush surfaces (8) being inclined towards each other. This angled arrangement of the two brush heads (4, 5) adapts the brush well to the curvature of the teeth. Furthermore, the brush can reach the interdental spaces and the edge of the gums more easily. The arrangement of two brush heads (4, 5) one behind the other produces a total brush area which is comparable with the brush area of conventional toothbrushes with a single brush head having a bristle region which is rectangular in plan view.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A46B 7/08; A46B 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A46B 7/08 (2006.01); A46B 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A46B 9/04 (2013.01); A46B 7/08 (2013.01); A46B 2200/1066 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9741753 A1 19971113; AU 2285497 A 19971126; BR 9708914 A 19990803; DE 59705673 D1 20020117; EP 0901329 A1 19990317; EP 0901329 B1 20011205; ID 17846 A 19980129; NO 985165 A 19981105; NO 985165 D0 19981105

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-04-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050415

2005-02-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040408

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-04-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030424

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-04-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030408

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705673 20020117

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

1999-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991011

1999-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980918

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI