Global patent index - EP 0901447 B1

EP 0901447 B1 2000-08-16 - SURF- OR SAIL-BOARD AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (en)

SURF- OR SAIL-BOARD AND METHOD OF PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (de)

SURF- ODER SEGELBRETT UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

PLANCHE DE SURF OU PLANCHE A VOILE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION

Publication

EP 0901447 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97925939 A

Priority

  • DE 19622223 A
  • EP 9702645 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19622223A1] The invention concerns a surf-board comprising a substantially elongate flat float-shaped basic body which, in use, lies with its underside (11) on the water and whose upper side (10) is provided with a surface for supporting the feet of the board user. Secured to the underside of the board is at least one fin (40). In order to accommodate this fin, the basic body has an opening (26, 34) which extends from the underside to the upper side and whose extension in the transverse direction of the board, that is transversely to the direction of travel and transversely to the surface plane of the fin, is smaller than the cross-section of the fin. Preferably, the outer edges of the fin cross-section at the point where it is connected to the board are shaped such that the outer edges abut the underside of the board in a substantially continuous manner.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 35/79

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 35/79 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 35/793 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19622223 A1 19971204; AU 3091897 A 19980105; AU 730180 B2 20010301; EP 0901447 A1 19990317; EP 0901447 B1 20000816; ES 2151274 T3 20001216; PT 901447 E 20010131; US 6068531 A 20000530; WO 9746444 A1 19971211; ZA 9704772 B 19980114

INPADOC legal status

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030524

2004-02-27 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2004-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040130

2004-01-14 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20030523

2003-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-05-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030524

2003-05-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030523

2002-06-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020625

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-06-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020617

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020531

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020531

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2151274

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-12-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-11-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001101

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB PT

1999-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990325

1999-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981127

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB PT