Global Patent Index - EP 0901452 B1

EP 0901452 B1 2001-05-02 - MULTI-CHAMBER AMPOULE FOR MEASURED DOSES OF LIQUIDS

Title (en)

MULTI-CHAMBER AMPOULE FOR MEASURED DOSES OF LIQUIDS

Title (de)

MEHRKAMMER-AMPULLE FÜR PORTIONIERTE FLÜSSIGKEITEN

Title (fr)

AMPOULE A CHAMBRES MULTIPLES POUR LIQUIDES SOUS FORME DOSEE

Publication

EP 0901452 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98912226 A

Priority

  • DE 9800430 W
  • DE 19706932 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19706932A1] The invention relates to a multi-chamber ampoule for measured doses of liquids, comprising an outer sleeve (2) of elastic material which on the inside has a chamber (12) which extends along an axis (4) and is closed off by a base part (31) at the lower end. Said multi-chamber ampoule also comprises a closing element which seals the outer sleeve (2) at its head end and has a micro-brush (1) which at its tip (10) has an element (11) capable of absorbing a liquid. According to the invention, the micro-brush (1) is positioned in an inner sleeve (3) which can be moved inside the outer sleeve (2) in the manner of a plunger.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 81/32; A61M 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 34/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 34/045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19706932 A1 19980827; AT 200881 T 20010515; DE 19880151 D2 19990408; EP 0901452 A1 19990317; EP 0901452 B1 20010502; US 6227736 B1 20010508; WO 9836994 A1 19980827

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160901

2016-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800660

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-06-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SULZER MIXPAC AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: DENTACO DENTALINDUSTRIE UND -MARKETING GMBH, 61352 BAD HOMBURG, DE

- Document: DE 59800660

- Effective date: 20110325

2002-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-04-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020214

2001-12-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-06-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800660 20010607

2001-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

2001-05-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200881 T 20010515

2000-07-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000605

1999-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981106

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI