Global Patent Index - EP 0901538 B1

EP 0901538 B1 2000-04-19 - BASCULE BRIDGE

Title (en)

BASCULE BRIDGE

Title (de)

HEBEBRÜCKE

Title (fr)

PONT BASCULANT

Publication

EP 0901538 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97921576 A

Priority

  • CH 9700212 W
  • CH 133996 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9745594A1] In order that bridges located in exposed sites do not increase the risk of flooding at high-water, they are raised on at least one side in the form of bascule bridges in order to allow the water to run freely in its bed. The reaching of the high-water level and the high-water itself determine the moment when the bascule bridge should be raised. When the high-water level is reached, water can flow through lateral openings (1) in the bank into tanks (2) and fill the latter. The weight of the filled tanks (2) is sufficient to raise the bascule bridge on one or both sides out of its operating position into the high-water position. The raised bridge allows the high-water to run freely in its entire bed. When the high-water has receded, the water is let out of the tanks (2) and the bridge is lowered into its operating position once more.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01D 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01D 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01D 15/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9745594 A1 19971204; AT 191941 T 20000515; AU 2761297 A 19980105; DE 59701470 D1 20000525; EP 0901538 A1 19990317; EP 0901538 B1 20000419

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-01-14 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030526

2003-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030526

2002-08-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020828

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-05-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020502

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010301

2000-09-15 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-05-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000526

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701470 20000525

2000-05-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO FELDMANN AG

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-04-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191941 T 20000515

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990712

1999-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981203

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI