Global patent index - EP 0901604 B1

EP 0901604 B1 2000-02-16 - SAFETY MECHANISM FOR RIFLES WITH A CYLINDRICAL BREECH

Title (en)

SAFETY MECHANISM FOR RIFLES WITH A CYLINDRICAL BREECH

Title (de)

SICHERUNG FÜR GEWEHRE MIT ZYLINDERVERSCHLUSS

Title (fr)

MECANISME DE SURETE POUR ARMES A FEU A CULASSE CYLINDRIQUE

Publication

EP 0901604 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97925760 A

Priority

  • AT 9700116 W
  • AT 98796 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9747940A1] A safety for rifles with a housing (1) that holds a breech block (3), and an activating part (14) located on the grip of the stock, which is operatively connected to a stop piece (12) for a lug (30) that is stressed by the force of a striker spring (7) when the breech is cocked, and in which a breech retaining piece that can be retracted against the force of a spring, and engages with a guide groove (11) of the breech block, is provided near the stop piece (12), is to be improved, and made more convenient to operate. For this purpose, the activating part (13) is hinged to a safety member (18) and a slide rod (24); the stop piece (12) has a stopping face (21) at the bottom, and the breech retaining piece (10) has a first transverse pin (23); the safety member (18) has a first (20) and a second stopping face (22); the slide rod (24) has a control ramp (25) which interacts with a second transverse pin (26) of the breech retaining piece (10) in such a way that the breech retaining piece (10) is retracted into a further safety position of the activating part (13).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 17/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 17/32 (2006.01); F41A 17/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 17/32 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9747940 A1 19971218; AT 189837 T 20000315; AT A98796 A 20010715; CZ 295405 B6 20050817; CZ 9803951 A3 20000816; DE 59701137 D1 20000323; EP 0901604 A1 19990317; EP 0901604 B1 20000216; ES 2146469 T3 20000801; US 6131325 A 20001017

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160614

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-03-07 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

- Effective date: 20140204

2014-03-07 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: STEYR MANNLICHER GMBH, AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20140204

2014-01-29 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: STEYR MANNLICHER GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20140123

2014-01-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: STEYR MANNLICHER GMBH, AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59701137

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131128

2014-01-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59701137

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: V. FUENER EBBINGHAUS FINCK HANO, DE

- Effective date: 20131128

2004-04-16 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2004-04-16 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2004-04-16 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

- Ref Legal Event Code: CJ

2004-04-16 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2004-03-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2003-12-31 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2003-11-30 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *STEYR MANNLICHER HOLDING G.M.B.H.EYERSPERIGRING 4

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECA

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-11-30 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *STEYR MANNLICHER HOLDING G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECH

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-11-30 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: *STEYR MANNLICHER HOLDING G.M.B.H.EYERSPERIGRING 4

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECN

- Effective date: 20031106

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2146469

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000324

2000-04-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-03-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701137

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-23

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT

2000-02-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 189837

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990412

1999-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981113

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT