Global Patent Index - EP 0901605 B1

EP 0901605 B1 2000-02-16 - REPEATING RIFLE WITH SEMIRIGIDLY LOCKABLE BOLT ACTION AND STRIKING-PIN SAFETY

Title (en)

REPEATING RIFLE WITH SEMIRIGIDLY LOCKABLE BOLT ACTION AND STRIKING-PIN SAFETY

Title (de)

REPETIERGEWEHR MIT HALBSTARR ARRETIERBAREM ZYLINDERVERSCHLUSS UND SCHLAGBOLZENSICHERUNG

Title (fr)

ARME A REPETITION A CULASSE CYLINDRIQUE A BLOCAGE SEMI-RIGIDE ET A SURETE DE PERCUTEUR

Publication

EP 0901605 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97925761 A

Priority

  • AT 9700117 W
  • AT 98696 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9747941A1] A repeating rifle with bolt action consists of a breech housing (1), a breech block (3) that can slide and turn in this, and has a sliding endpiece (4) and a striking pin (6) having a striking-pin lug (8) stressed by a striker spring (7), with the breech block (3) having in its interior a tensioning slotted link that interacts with the striking-pin lug (8). In order to achieve a maximum of safety and operating convenience with a minimum of construction effort, a cocking curved bushing (33) that can slide longitudinally between guides acts as the tensioning slotted link in the breech block (3); the striker spring (7) is supported by this; and the endpiece (4) has a guide sleeve (36) that interacts with the cocking curved bushing (33). The cocking curved bushing is rotationally fixed with the rotary breech block and the guide sleeve is rotationally fixed with the non-rotary endpiece.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 17/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 17/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 17/56 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9747941 A1 19971218; AT 189838 T 20000315; AT 411295 B 20031125; AT A98696 A 20030415; CZ 295236 B6 20050615; CZ 9803952 A3 20001011; DE 59701138 D1 20000323; EP 0901605 A1 19990317; EP 0901605 B1 20000216; ES 2146470 T3 20000801; US 6178682 B1 20010130

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160614

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-03-07 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

- Effective date: 20140204

2014-03-07 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: STEYR MANNLICHER GMBH, AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20140204

2014-01-29 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: STEYR MANNLICHER GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20140123

2014-01-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: STEYR MANNLICHER GMBH, AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59701138

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131128

2014-01-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59701138

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: V. FUENER EBBINGHAUS FINCK HANO, DE

- Effective date: 20131128

2004-04-16 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2004-04-16 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2004-04-16 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

- Ref Legal Event Code: CJ

2004-04-16 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2003-12-31 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2003-11-30 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *STEYR MANNLICHER HOLDING G.M.B.H.EYERSPERIGRING 4

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECA

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-11-30 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *STEYR MANNLICHER HOLDING G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECH

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-11-30 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: *STEYR MANNLICHER HOLDING G.M.B.H.EYERSPERIGRING 4

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECN

- Effective date: 20031106

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2146470

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000324

2000-04-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-03-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701138

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-23

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT

2000-02-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 189838

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990412

1999-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981118

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FI FR GB IT