Global Patent Index - EP 0901629 A4

EP 0901629 A4 2000-02-02 - CARBOHYDRATE-BASED LIGAND LIBRARY, ASSAY AND METHOD

Title (en)

CARBOHYDRATE-BASED LIGAND LIBRARY, ASSAY AND METHOD

Title (de)

KOHLENHYDRATBIBLIOTHEK, ASSAY UND METHODE

Title (fr)

BIBLIOTHEQUE DE LIGANDS A BASE D'HYDRATES DE CARBONE, DOSAGE ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANTS

Publication

EP 0901629 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97916164 A

Priority

  • US 9704639 W
  • US 1537996 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9735202A1] A carbohydrate-based library is described which comprises a plurality of distinct sugar-containing ligands each bound to a resolvable portion of a solid support. The library is constructed by a method that includes a glycosyl bond-forming step. Libraries of differing sizes can be prepared by the method of the present invention in which large numbers of distinct species are made substantially concurrently by the formation of glycosyl bonds among many types of participants. Moreover, an assay, which allows the substantial simultaneous screening of essentially all the members of the library, is described. The isolation of novel ligands of low-affinity is thus facilitated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 33/543; A61K 39/385; C07H 1/00; C07H 5/08; C07H 15/12; C07H 15/14; C12N 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07H 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07H 1/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9419360 A1 19940901 - UNIV PRINCETON [US]
  • [X] EP 0601417 A2 19940615 - HOECHST AG [DE]
  • [X] WO 9503315 A2 19950202 - OXFORD GLYCOSYSTEMS LTD [GB], et al
  • [PX] WO 9636627 A1 19961121 - GLYCOMED INC [US]
  • [X] NICOLAOU K C ET AL: "TOTAL SYNTHESIS OF THE TUMOR-ASSOCIATED LEX FAMILY OF GLYCOSPHINGOLIPIDS", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY,US,AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC, vol. 112, pages 3693-3695, XP000601632, ISSN: 0002-7863
  • [X] JOHNSTON J N ET AL: "Studies directed toward the total synthesis of polycavernoside A. enantioselective synthesis of the disaccharide component", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, vol. 36, no. 25, 1995, pages 4341-4344, XP004027848, ISSN: 0040-4039
  • [X] BAMHAOUD T ET AL: "A NOVEL APPROACH TO THE CONSTRUCTION OF HYDROXYLAMINO INTERGLYCOSIDIC LINKAGES", JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, CHEMICAL COMMUNICATIONS,GB,CHEMICAL SOCIETY. LETCHWORTH, no. 20, 1992, pages 1494-1496, XP000857310, ISSN: 0022-4936
  • [X] BECKER D ET AL: "SYNTHESIS AND UTILIZATION OF SACCHARIDE INTERMEDIATES", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHING COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, vol. 248, 1993, pages 129-141, XP000857309, ISSN: 0008-6215
  • [X] S.CAO ET AL.: "Phase Transfer Catalyzed Anomeric Nucleophilic Substitutions Occur by an SN2-Type Mechanism.", CARBOHYDRATE LETTERS, vol. 2, no. 1, 1996, pages 27 - 34, XP000856877
  • [PX] S.KOMBA ET AL.: "Synthesis and Biological Activities of Three Sulfates Sialyl Lex Ganglioside Analogues for Clarifying the Real Carbohydrate Ligand Structure of L-Selectin.", BIOORGANIC AND MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 4, no. 11, November 1996 (1996-11-01), pages 1833 - 1847, XP000856927
  • See also references of WO 9735202A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9735202 A1 19970925; AU 2341397 A 19971010; CA 2249290 A1 19970925; EP 0901629 A1 19990317; EP 0901629 A4 20000202

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020608

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020128

2000-02-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19991220

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 01N 33/543 A, 7C 12N 9/00 B, 7C 07H 5/08 B, 7C 07H 15/12 B, 7C 07H 15/14 B, 7A 61K 39/385 B, 7C 07H 1/00 B

1999-05-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KAHNE, DANIEL, E.

1999-05-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LOEBACH, JENNIFER

1999-05-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YAN, LIN

1999-05-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LIANG, RUI

1999-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980921

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE