Global Patent Index - EP 0901693 B1

EP 0901693 B1 2000-07-19 - INSULATION PIERCING PLUGGING CONTACT

Title (en)

INSULATION PIERCING PLUGGING CONTACT

Title (de)

ISOLATIONSDURCHDRINGENDER STECKKONTAKT

Title (fr)

CONTACT ENFICHABLE AUTODENUDANT PAR PERCAGE DE L'ISOLATION

Publication

EP 0901693 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97920890 A

Priority

  • GB 9610994 A
  • IB 9700570 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9745894A1] A contact (2) comprises an IDC section (4) and a plugging contact section (6). Such contacts can be used for interconnecting conducting wires in stackable pluggable modules, for example, as used in the telecommunications industry. The plugging contact section comprises a slot (16) for plugging to a complementary blade of an IDC contact. Pointed tips (22) and strengthening ribs (30) are provided to enable piercing through insulation layers of a conductor terminated to the complementary IDC contact. To provide a particularly effective strengthening rib, but nevertheless effective piercing of the insulation, the outer oblique cutting edge (24) of the piercing section is stepped (36) with respect to a second cutting section (34).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/242 (2013.01); H01R 12/616 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9745894 A1 19971204; AU 2710297 A 19980105; DE 69702608 D1 20000824; DE 69702608 T2 20010329; EP 0901693 A1 19990317; EP 0901693 B1 20000719; ES 2150245 T3 20001116; GB 9610994 D0 19960731

INPADOC legal status


2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090520

2010-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090520

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080529

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060522

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070131

2006-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-05-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060522

2005-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050630

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-06-09 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050609

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-05-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050517

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2150245

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69702608

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-24

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

1999-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991013

1999-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981112

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB