Global Patent Index - EP 0901724 B1

EP 0901724 B1 2002-11-13 - METHOD FOR PROCESSING OF DATA WITH A RADIO RECEIVER

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PROCESSING OF DATA WITH A RADIO RECEIVER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON DATEN MIT EINEM RUNDFUNKEMPFÄNGER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNEES AU MOYEN D'UN RECEPTEUR RADIO

Publication

EP 0901724 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97925882 A

Priority

  • DE 9701087 W
  • DE 19621609 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19621609A1] The invention relates to a method for processing of data with a radio receiver which evaluates Radio Data System (RDS) data and Traffic Message System (TMC) data. For this purpose, time windows are provided in the stream of data, and either RDS data exclusively or RDS data and TMC data are processed inside said time windows. The start of the time windows can be displayed by system reports (sy).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04B 1/16 (2006.01); H04H 20/55 (2008.01); H04H 40/09 (2008.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/55 (2013.01); H04H 40/09 (2013.01); H04H 2201/13 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19621609 A1 19971204; EP 0901724 A1 19990317; EP 0901724 B1 20021113; ES 2190534 T3 20030801; JP 2000512448 A 20000919; JP 3892047 B2 20070314; KR 20000016012 A 20000325; WO 9747101 A1 19971211

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170527

2017-06-21 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170527

2017-05-28 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59708719

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140529

2015-06-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150626

2015-02-24 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140529

2013-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130521

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120525

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-06-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110519 AND 20110525

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2190534 T3

2003-07-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2003-06-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-16 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-04-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030315

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708719 20021219

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010510

1999-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981230

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE