Global Patent Index - EP 0901760 B1

EP 0901760 B1 2001-03-14 - Slide and extensible table equipped with such a slide

Title (en)

Slide and extensible table equipped with such a slide

Title (de)

Auszugschiene und Ausziehtisch mit einer solchen Auszugschiene

Title (fr)

Coulisse et table à coulisse équipée d'une telle coulisse

Publication

EP 0901760 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97115266 A

Priority

EP 97115266 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0901760A1] Rod (44) connected directly or indirectly with the runner (14) acts as transmission member for actuating a locking mechanism (64) from its free end. Pullout rail with a support (10) fixed to a furniture part has an extendible telescopic runner (14) on the support, a fixing rod (44) directly or indirectly connected to the runner and running parallel to it. The rod (44) is lockable by using a locking mechanism (64) to the support (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 1/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0901760 A1 19990317; EP 0901760 B1 20010314; AT 199632 T 20010315; DE 29723944 U1 19990708; DE 59703145 D1 20010419; ES 2154864 T3 20010416

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080904

2009-11-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080904

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080903

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080903

2009-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-07-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090529

2009-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BECKER MANFRED

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080926

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070831

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070926

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070830

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070907

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-11-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070919

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-09-04 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070904

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-03-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2001-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703145 20010419

2001-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2154864 T3

2001-04-12 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2001-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19970903;LV PAYMENT 19970903;RO PAYMENT 19970903;SI PAYMENT 19970903

2001-03-14 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

2001-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199632 T 20010315

1999-12-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991109

1999-12-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI

1999-12-01 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19970903;LV PAYMENT 19970903;RO PAYMENT 19970903;SI PAYMENT 19970903

1999-03-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980312

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI

1999-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 970903;LV PAYMENT 970903;RO PAYMENT 970903;SI PAYMENT 970903