Global Patent Index - EP 0901765 A3

EP 0901765 A3 2001-01-24 - Display counter,especially for baked products

Title (en)

Display counter,especially for baked products

Title (de)

Verkaufstheke, insbesondere für Backwaren

Title (fr)

Comptoir de vente,en particulier pour produits de boulangerie

Publication

EP 0901765 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98114585 A

Priority

DE 19738063 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0901765A2] Upper (4) and lower (3) support for an intermediate display shelf (1) are joined by a frame and can be raised or lowered by a mechanical, electrical, hydraulic or manual mechanism (2), so that the lower or upper support forms a plane with the main display shelf (5). Sales counter, especially for bakery goods has a customer side (14) that is closed, a top horizontal surface (12), a sales side (15) having accessible displaying area with a low table (16) opposite the horizontal surface (12). The sales side has main and intermediate displaying part (5) and (1) which are arranged on the counter. The intermediate displaying part (1) has an upper and lower supports (4,3). Upper (4) and lower (3) support for an intermediate display shelf (1) are joined by a frame and can be raised or lowered by a mechanical, electrical, hydraulic or manual mechanism (2), so that the lower or upper support forms a plane with the main display shelf (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 3/06; A47F 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/00 (2006.01); A47F 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/007 (2013.01); A47F 3/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0901765 A2 19990317; EP 0901765 A3 20010124; DE 19738063 C1 19990520

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021218

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE LI

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010215

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

1999-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI