Global Patent Index - EP 0901770 B1

EP 0901770 B1 2001-05-23 - Dishwashing machine with height-adjustable rack

Title (en)

Dishwashing machine with height-adjustable rack

Title (de)

Geschirrspülmaschine mit einem in der Höhe einstellbaren Geschirrkorb

Title (fr)

Lave vaisselle avec panier ajustable en hauteur

Publication

EP 0901770 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98115699 A

Priority

IT PN970037 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0901770A2] Dishwashing machine with a rack supported on each side in the washing vessel of said machine and selectively displaceable from an upper position to a lower position, and vice-versa, by means of a front pin and a rear pin that are slidable along two slots in a side-by-side arranmgement, respectively. Said slots (23, 24) are asymmetrical and in the sape of a V turned in such a way as to have their vertices facing each other. The lower legs of said slots comprise respective seats (23i, 24i) adapted to accomodate their respective sliding pins (13, 14) so as to support the rack (10) in the lower position thereof, whereas the upper legs of said slots comprise respective seats (25, 24s) adapted to accomodate the respective sliding pins (13, 14) so as to support the rack (10) in the upper position thereof. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/504 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0901770 A2 19990317; EP 0901770 A3 19990519; EP 0901770 B1 20010523; DE 69800823 D1 20010628; DE 69800823 T2 20010906; ES 2159416 T3 20011001; IT 243433 Y1 20020304; IT PN970037 U1 19990312

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060821

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060820

2007-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060821

2007-06-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070430

2007-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060820

2007-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2005-08-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050820

2005-08-05 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050805

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-07-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050715

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-07-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050713

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-07-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050711

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2159416 T3

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800823 20010628

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-10-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: PROPRIA S.R.L.

2000-01-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

1999-12-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990917

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI