Global Patent Index - EP 0901830 A3

EP 0901830 A3 2000-12-20 - Wide jet high pressure nozzle

Title (en)

Wide jet high pressure nozzle

Title (de)

Hochdruckdüse mit Breitstrahl

Title (fr)

Buse haute pression à jet large

Publication

EP 0901830 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98117042 A

Priority

DE 19739933 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0901830A2] The device has a high pressure channel with one or more axial bores (27). The bores open into a ring channel (19), which branches radially off the high pressure channel. The flow passes from the ring channel into an axially forward directed outlet channel (21,22), extending parallel to the high pressure channel. Sealing in the low pressure channel is via the sealing edge of a setting part (9), which engages on a stationary O-ring seal (12) or soft seal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 1/16; B05B 1/04; B05B 1/12; B08B 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/16 (2006.01); B08B 3/02 (2006.01); B05B 7/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/1627 (2013.01); B08B 3/028 (2013.01); B05B 7/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0901830 A2 19990317; EP 0901830 A3 20001220; DE 19739933 A1 19990401

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040114

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020530

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010404

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

1999-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI