Global Patent Index - EP 0901833 A3

EP 0901833 A3 2000-12-06 - Improved powder feeding apparatus for treaded articles

Title (en)

Improved powder feeding apparatus for treaded articles

Title (de)

Pulverzufuhrvorrichtung zur Pulverbeschichtung von Werkstücken mit einem Gewinde

Title (fr)

Appareil d'alimentation en poudre pour le poudrage de pièces filetées

Publication

EP 0901833 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98650061 A

Priority

US 92660197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0901833A2] A continuous-flow powder feeding device for use in applying powder to threaded articles. A by-pass line (25) permits powder to constantly circulate through a powder supply line (35). In response to a signal that a threaded article is in a position for powder to be applied, the powder supply line is automatically moved out of communication with the by-pass line (25), and into communication with a powder application line (35). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 7/1404 (2013.01); B05B 7/1468 (2013.01); B05B 7/1477 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0901833 A2 19990317; EP 0901833 A3 20001206; AU 8416498 A 19990325; CA 2246924 A1 19990310

INPADOC legal status


2001-11-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-09-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI