Global Patent Index - EP 0901856 B1

EP 0901856 B1 2002-12-11 - Integrated double seam grinder for welding preparation

Title (en)

Integrated double seam grinder for welding preparation

Title (de)

Integrierter Doppelfalzschleifer für die handwerkgerechte Schweissvorbereitung

Title (fr)

Outil de meulage avec deux meules pour préparation de soudage

Publication

EP 0901856 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98116142 A

Priority

DE 29716114 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0901856A2] The grinder (1) has a drive device for a grindstone (7) surfaced with abrasive material for grinding sheet metal. There is also a second grindstone (8), both grindstones being driven by the same drive device. The sheet is placed between the two grindstones and is ground on both sides simultaneously. The grindstones are on drive spindles, at least one of which can be turned or moved linearly relative to the other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23B 23/02; B24B 23/02; B24B 41/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 23/02 (2006.01); B24B 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 23/02 (2013.01); B24B 27/0076 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29716114 U1 19990114; EP 0901856 A2 19990317; EP 0901856 A3 19990707; EP 0901856 B1 20021211; JP H11151653 A 19990608; TW 383248 B 20000301; US 6193592 B1 20010227

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050827

2005-06-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-05-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-04-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-04-20 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040827

2005-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050301

2004-08-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040827

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-09-01 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030901

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-19 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030819

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-14 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030814

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-07-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030730

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806605 20030123

2003-01-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021212

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010320

2000-03-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2000-03-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000103

1999-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-07-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-07-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6B 23B 23/02 A, 6B 24B 41/04 B, 6B 24B 23/02 B

1999-04-28 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1999-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI