Global Patent Index - EP 0901974 A3

EP 0901974 A3 2001-01-31 - Loading table for container handling machines

Title (en)

Loading table for container handling machines

Title (de)

Vortisch an Gefässbehandlungsmaschinen

Title (fr)

Table de chargement pour appareils de manutention des récipients

Publication

EP 0901974 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98113032 A

Priority

DE 19740373 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0901974A2] The front table (1) consists of container transporters and container guides (2-4) only in the area of the container transportation plane. Drive units are positioned at a distance below the plane, and are covered hood-like by a support plate. The drive shafts are enclosed by tower-like casings (8) extending to the plane. The casings are fastened, sealed to the plate. The plate is a single cast and/or welded component.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65G 41/00; B67C 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 43/50 (2006.01); B65G 29/00 (2006.01); B67C 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67C 7/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0901974 A2 19990317; EP 0901974 A3 20010131; DE 19740373 A1 19990318; JP H11180531 A 19990706; US 6058985 A 20000509

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030211

2001-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011026

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR IT NL

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010223

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65G 41/00 A, 7B 67C 7/00 B

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT NL

1999-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI