Global Patent Index - EP 0901980 A3

EP 0901980 A3 2000-11-15 - Elevator drive

Title (en)

Elevator drive

Title (de)

Antrieb für Aufzüge

Title (fr)

Moteur d'ascenseur

Publication

EP 0901980 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98116393 A

Priority

DE 19739899 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0901980A2] Drive pulley (4) is driven by a permanent magnet-excited synchronous motor (2) via a planetary gear unit (3). Preferably, a rotor (7) fitted with permanent magnets is fixed to a drive shaft (13) of the gear unit, the two being on common bearing in the gear unit housing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/0453 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0901980 A2 19990317; EP 0901980 A3 20001115; EP 0901980 B1 20040804; AT 272565 T 20040815; DE 19739899 A1 19990318

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161028

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160830

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160830

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160830

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160830

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59811743

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE UND RECHTSANWALT DR. WEISS, ARA, DE

2015-07-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59811743

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE UND RECHTSANWALT WEISS, ARAT & , DE

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070829

2009-05-22 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070829

2008-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ALPHA GETRIEBEBAU G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20070831

2006-08-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060818

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-16 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060816

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-16 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20060816

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-07-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050506

2005-07-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040909

2004-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811743 P 20040909

2004-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FI FR GB IT LU NL

2004-08-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010913

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE FI FR GB IT LU NL

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001212

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FI FR GB IT LU NL

1999-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI