Global Patent Index - EP 0902110 A3

EP 0902110 A3 2000-04-12 - Method for connecting two knitted parts on a flat bed knitting machine

Title (en)

Method for connecting two knitted parts on a flat bed knitting machine

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Verbinden zweier Gestrickteile auf einer Flachstrickmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé pour lier deux parties tricotées dans un métier à tricoter rectiligne

Publication

EP 0902110 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98115237 A

Priority

DE 19739136 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0902110A2] The fabrics (1,2) are first transferred to adjacent needles on the same needle bed. Stitches from one fabric are then transferred to the other fabric at a similar distance from the join so that the boundary stitches are on the same needle. This is cast off and the process is repeated on alternate sides till all stitches from the two fabrics are connected.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19739136 A1 19990311; EP 0902110 A2 19990317; EP 0902110 A3 20000412; EP 0902110 B1 20040324; ES 2215257 T3 20041001; US 6192716 B1 20010227

INPADOC legal status


2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110813

2011-07-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100715

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090813

2006-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050816

2006-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2005-08-16 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050816

2005-03-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041228

2004-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2215257 T3

2004-08-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040824

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-04 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040804

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811041 P 20040429

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2002-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020730

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES IT

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000923

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

1999-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI