Global Patent Index - EP 0902147 A3

EP 0902147 A3 2001-05-09 - Door installation

Title (en)

Door installation

Title (de)

Türanlage

Title (fr)

Dispositif de porte

Publication

EP 0902147 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98116896 A

Priority

DE 19739820 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0902147A2] Rollers (27) run on a rail (10) attached to the frame of the door structure. The drive motor (30) and at least one of the rollers are mounted in a unit attached to the door leaf. Preferably the motor is flange mounted on a roller mounting (20) which supports the driven roller and drives the roller by friction or a positive connection.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/635 (2015.01); E05F 15/641 (2015.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/641 (2013.01); E05F 15/635 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/434 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/674 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/684 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/722 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/726 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/46 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/266 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0902147 A2 19990317; EP 0902147 A3 20010509; DE 19739820 A1 19990401; US 6073394 A 20000613

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020604

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020124

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB NL

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011105

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1999-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI