Global Patent Index - EP 0902150 A3

EP 0902150 A3 2000-02-02 - Device for coating spacing frames for insulating glazing

Title (en)

Device for coating spacing frames for insulating glazing

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Beschichten von Abstandhalterrahmen für Isolierglasscheiben

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le revêtement de cadres d'espacement pour vitrages isolants

Publication

EP 0902150 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98890239 A

Priority

AT 154097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0902150A2] Both sides of a conveyor belt (1) have nozzles for applying the adhesive or sealing material to the side surfaces (4) of the spacer piece frame (2). Above the conveyor belt are upward protruding parts of the spacer piece frame. Stepped pressure rollers (10) press the arms of the spacer piece frame resting on the conveyor belt against the belt. The pressure rollers resting on the arms resting on the conveyor belt are swivelled away. The pressure rollers rest solely on the side edges of the inner surface (6) of the arm, resting on the conveyor belt, of the hollow profiled bar (5) forming the spacer piece frame.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/673

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/673 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/67321 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29719564 U1 19980205; AT 405863 B 19991227; AT A154097 A 19990415; DE 59810384 D1 20040122; EP 0902150 A2 19990317; EP 0902150 A3 20000202; EP 0902150 B1 20031210; ES 2210709 T3 20040701; US 6245145 B1 20010612

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160829

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160822

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-07-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59810384

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE HENKEL, BREUER & PARTNER, DE

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070820

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070818

2008-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070820

2008-06-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20080327

2008-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070818

2006-08-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060830

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060824

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-12-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2210709 T3

2004-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-03-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040220

2004-03-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-01-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810384 P 20040122

2003-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SUSI PRYDE-HAENI BSC

2003-12-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2003-12-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI

2003-12-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-12-10 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-12-10 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-07-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR COATING SPACING FRAMES FOR INSULATING GLAZING

2003-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021125

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-10-11 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000128

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000128

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI