Global patent index - EP 0902153 A3

EP 0902153 A3 2000-04-05 - Sliding element device

Title (en)

Sliding element device

Title (de)

Gleitelementvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif à élément coulissant

Publication

EP 0902153 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98116915 A

Priority

DE 19739688 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0902153A2] The movable panels have rectangular panels (2) with rollers (6) at the top (6a) and bottom (6b) to run between top and bottom guides. Each pair of rollers has offset rolling axes straddling the central plane through its panel, and is fitted near to the top and bottom corners of the panel. The panels can be slid to one end of the balcony where they are stacked between parallel guides.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/92; E05D 15/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/06 (2006.01); E06B 3/92 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/924 (2013.01); E05D 15/0613 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/692 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/148 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/15 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0902153 A2 19990317; EP 0902153 A3 20000405; DE 19739688 A1 19990318; DE 19739688 C2 20000427

INPADOC legal status

2001-07-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001006

2001-01-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI