Global Patent Index - EP 0902180 B1

EP 0902180 B1 2002-11-13 - Lightweight metal piston for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Lightweight metal piston for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Leichtmetallkolben für Brennkraftmaschinen

Title (fr)

Piston à métal léger pour un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0902180 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98117145 A

Priority

DE 19740065 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0902180A2] In a light metal piston with a roof-shaped head, the lugs are offset in the pin axis direction and an open cavity is provided above the outer face of each lug. The inner faces of the lug have a trapezium or stepped shape and the shaft length is 40-45% of the piston diameter. The light metal piston used in an internal combustion engine has a roof-shaped head (2) with a combustion space trough (4), the novelty being that (a) the lugs (14) are offset in the pin axis direction such that the outer lug spacing is 60-65% of the piston diameter or less; (b) an open cavity (22), with an included angle of 45-60 degrees , is provided above the outer faces (18) of the offset lugs (14) and extends towards the piston head (2) in the region behind the ring region (6); (c) the lug inner faces (20) have a trapezium or stepped shape; and (d) the shaft length (Ls) is 40-45% of the piston diameter.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 3/00; F02F 3/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 3/00 (2006.01); F02F 3/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 3/00 (2013.01); F02F 3/26 (2013.01); F05C 2201/021 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0902180 A2 19990317; EP 0902180 A3 19991215; EP 0902180 B1 20021113; DE 19740065 A1 19990318

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-07-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806259

- Effective date: 20120403

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100922

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070910

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070910

2006-09-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060922

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060921

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-07-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030221

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806259 20021219

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010924

2000-08-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6F 02F 3/00 A, 6F 02F 3/26 B

1999-11-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990917

1999-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-03-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI